EP1981136 - Laser diode with adjustable gain spectrum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xantima LLC 2215-B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | 02 /
Ortiz, Valentin c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | 03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | [2009/24] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 91191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin 15 Ter Impasse de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos 2 Avenue Albert 1er de Belgique 38000, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin 15 Ter Impasse de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos 2 Avenue Albert 1er de Belgique 38000, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin 15 Ter Impasse de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido c/o Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique 01191 Gif-sur-yvette cedex / FR | |||
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
Pelekanos, Nikolaos 2 Avenue Albert 1er de Belgique 38000, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Ortiz, Valentin 15 Ter Impasse de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Mula, Guido 107 Rue de Stalingrad 38100, Grenoble / FR | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08158430.2 | 04.10.1999 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | FR19980012558 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812558 | [2008/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981136 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1981136 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/06, H01S5/34 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
H01S5/0608 (EP,US);
H01S5/0622 (EP,US);
H01S5/0607 (EP,US);
H01S5/06206 (EP,US);
H01S5/3428 (EP,US);
H01S5/4043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/07] |
Former [2008/42] | DE, GB, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser mit abstimmbarem Verstärkungsspektrum | [2008/42] | English: | Laser diode with adjustable gain spectrum | [2008/42] | French: | Laser à semiconducteur, à spectre de gain accordable | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99402425.5 / EP0993088 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990402425) is 14.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5200969 (PAOLI THOMAS L [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 11, line 25 - page 13, line 11; figure 7b *; | [AD]EP0681200 (PELEKANOS NIKOLAOS THEMELIS [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP] - LE THOMAS N ET AL, "Piezoelectric effects in semiconductor heterostructures: applications and consequences", MICROELECTRONICS JOURNAL, MACKINTOSH PUBLICATIONS LTD. LUTON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0026-2692(02)00020-4, vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0026-2692, (20020701), pages 565 - 571, (20020701), XP026140988 [XP] 1 * page 566; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-2692(02)00020-4 | [A] - HUANG F Y, "QUANTUM-CONFINED FIELD-EFFECT WAVELENGTH TUNING IN A THREE -TERMINAL DOUBLE QUANTUM WELL LASER", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19900604), vol. 56, no. 23, pages 2282 - 2284, XP000149993 [A] 1-4,9 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.102940 | [AD] - LIU L Y ET AL, "TUNABLE COUPLED-QUANTUM-WELL LASER CONTROLLED BY AN ELECTRIC FIELD", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19920615), vol. 60, no. 24, pages 2971 - 2973, XP000269913 [AD] 1-4,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.106780 | [AD] - ORTIZ V ET AL, "EFFICIENT ALL-OPTICAL LIGHT MODULATION IN A PIEZOELECTRIC HETEROSTRUCTURE AT ROOM TEMPERATURE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19980223), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 963 - 965, XP000742795 [AD] 1-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.120935 | by applicant | EP0681200 | US5698863 | - N.K. DUTTA ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1997), vol. 70, page 1219 | - F. FAVRE ET AL., ELECTRON. LETT., (1986), vol. 22, page 795 | - S. MURATA; I. MITO, OPTICAL AND QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (1990), vol. 22, page 1 | - L.Y. LIU; E.E. MENDEZ; H. MEIER, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1992), vol. 60, page 2971 | - E. ANASTASSAKIS, PHYS. REV. B, (1992), vol. 46, page 4744 | - R. ANDRÉ ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1990), vol. 42, page 11392 | - V. ORTIZ; N.T. PELEKANOS; G. MULA, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1998), vol. 72, page 963 |