EP2003797 - Optical transmitting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | Optical transmitting apparatus, optical receiving apparatus, and optical communication system comprising them | ||
[2013/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Yuichi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku,Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Hoshida, Takeshi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Miura, Akira FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kai, Yutaka FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Ooi, Hiroki FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Rasmussen, Jens C. FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Nakamura, Kentaro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 08 /
Kuwata, Naoki FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 09 /
Nishizawa, Yoshinori FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 10 /
Takahara, Tomoo FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 11 /
Yuki, Masahiro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
Akiyama, Yuichi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku,Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Hoshida, Takeshi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Miura, Akira FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Kai, Yutaka FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Ooi, Hiroki FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Rasmussen, Jens C. FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
07 /
Nakamura, Kentaro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
08 /
Kuwata, Naoki FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
09 /
Nishizawa, Yoshinori FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
10 /
Takahara, Tomoo FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
11 /
Yuki, Masahiro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08158854.3 | 29.12.2005 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | JP20050150219 | 23.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005150219 | JP20050192971 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005192971 | JP20050293039 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005293039 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2003797 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003797 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/50, H04B10/516, H04B10/556, H04B10/66, H04B10/67 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G02F1/2255 (EP,US);
G02F1/0123 (EP,US);
H04B10/505 (EP,US);
H04B10/5051 (EP,US);
H04B10/5053 (EP,US);
H04B10/50575 (EP,US);
H04B10/50577 (EP,US);
H04B10/50595 (EP,US);
H04B10/5162 (EP,US);
H04B10/5165 (EP,US);
H04B10/5561 (EP,US);
H04B10/66 (EP,US);
H04B10/677 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H04B10/155 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/51] | Title | German: | Optische Übertragungsvorrichtung | [2013/15] | English: | Optical transmitting apparatus | [2013/15] | French: | Appareil de transmission optique | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/51] | Optische Übertragungsvorrichtung, optische Empfangsvorrichtung und optisches Kommunikationssystem damit | ||
Former [2008/51] | Optical transmitting apparatus, optical receiving apparatus, and optical communication system comprising them | ||
Former [2008/51] | Appareil de transmission optique, appareil de réception optique, et système de communication optique les comprenant | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05028634.3 / EP1727303 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050028634) is 10.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5532857 (GERTEL EITAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 26-49 * * column 4, lines 7-9 * * column 4, lines 26-37 * [A] 5; | [XA]US2005100281 (KIM JOO-YOUP [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 4,11,12 * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * [A] 5; | [A]WO03049333 (BOOKHAM TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 9 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 33 * * page 6, lines 11-29 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5926297 (ISHIKAWA GEORGE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 2,5,11,12 * * column 2, lines 7-10 * * column 5, lines 33-46 * * column 6, lines 54-61 * * column 7, lines 12-41 * * column 7, lines 55-60 * * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 6 * | by applicant | US2005100281 | US5532857 | JP2004516743 | JP2000162563 | JPH10228006 |