Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
22.04.2011 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
08.04.2011 | Change - applicant | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
28.12.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
28.12.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
18.11.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
03.09.2010 | Change - classification | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
03.09.2010 | Change - classification | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
31.08.2010 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.08.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
31.07.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.07.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.06.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.03.2010 | First examination report | |
18.03.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.03.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
27.11.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |