EP2139000 - Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding a speech and/or non-speech audio input signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2011/19] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wuebbolt, Oliver Auf dem Lärchenberge 8 30161 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Boehm, Johannes Sieberweg 35 37081 Göttingen / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08159018.4 | 25.06.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139000 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139000 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14, G10L19/02, G10L19/04, G10L11/02 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G10L19/24 (EP);
G10L19/0212 (EP);
G10L19/04 (EP);
G10L25/78 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | G10L19/14, // G10L19/02, G10L19/04, G10L11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/36] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung von Sprache bzw. Nicht-Sprache-Audioeingabesignalen | [2010/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding a speech and/or non-speech audio input signal | [2010/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil de codage ou de décodage d'un signal d'entrée audio vocal et/ou non vocal | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1278184 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0012] * * figures 2a,2b *; | [AD] - RAMPRASHAD S A, "A two stage hybrid embedded speech/audio coding structure", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 337 - 340, XP010279163 [AD] 1-4,14,15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [05.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674436 | by applicant | - S. RAGOT ET AL., "ITU-T G.729.1: An 8-32 Kbit/s scalable coder interoperable with G.729 for wideband telephony and voice over IP", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 2007, ICASSP 2007, vol. 4, pages 529 - 532 | - S.A. RAMPRASHAD, "A two stage hybrid embedded speech/audio coding structure", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 1998, ICASSP 1998, vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674436, pages 337 - 340, XP000854584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674436 | - M. PURAT; P. NOLL, "A new orthonormal wavelet packet decomposition for audio coding using frequency-varying modulated lapped transforms", IEEE ASSP WORKSHOP ON APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, (1995), doi:doi:10.1109/ASPAA.1995.482986, pages 183 - 186, XP010154661 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASPAA.1995.482986 | - M. PURAT; P. NOLL, "Audio coding with a dynamic wavelet packet decomposition based on frequency-varying modulated lapped transforms", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 1996, ICASSP, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1021 - 1024 | - JOHN P. PRINCEN; ALAN B. BRADLEY, ODDLY-STACKED TIME DOMAIN ALIAS CANCELLATION TRANSFORM | - "Analysis/synthesis filter bank design based on time domain aliasing cancellation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH SIGAL PROCESSING ASSP-34, (1986), vol. 5, pages 1153 - 1161 | - M.TEMERINAC; B.EDLER, "A unified approach to lapped or-thogonal transforms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (199201), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 111 - 116 | - B.EDLER, "Codierung von Audiosignalen mit uberlappender Transformation und adap- tiven Fensterfunktionen", FREQUENZ, (1989), vol. 43, pages 252 - 256 |