EP2027944 - Method for environmental stabilization of graves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protempra AS Kongensgt. 16 0153 Oslo / NO | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O̸stbye, Kjell Larsen Storgata 23 B 2406 Elverum / NO | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Balle, Morten, et al Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | [2010/03] |
Former [2009/09] | Balle, Morten, et al Protector Intellectual Property Consultants AS Box 5074 Majorstuen 0301 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 08159214.9 | 27.06.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | NO20070003344 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: NO 20073344 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027944 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2027944 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027944 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B09C1/08 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP);
B09C1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umgebungsstabilisierung von Gräbern | [2010/01] | English: | Method for environmental stabilization of graves | [2009/09] | French: | Procédé de stabilisation environnementale de tombes | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/09] | Verfahren zur Umgebungsstabilisierung von Kies | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 08.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.04.2010 | EE | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | HR | 21.04.2010 | LT | 21.04.2010 | LV | 21.04.2010 | MT | 21.04.2010 | PL | 21.04.2010 | RO | 21.04.2010 | SI | 21.04.2010 | SK | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | BG | 21.07.2010 | NO | 21.07.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | ES | 01.08.2010 | IS | 21.08.2010 | HU | 22.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
TR | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
HU | 22.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
HU | 22.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 21.04.2010 | |
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10116113 (ROLKE BEATE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,6,7 *; | [AD]EP1457188 (KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10* claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE10355067 (SCHWARZKOPF JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1457188 |