EP2012381 - Electrode-Electrolyte Composite Particles for a Fuel Cell and Method for the Preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1, Hawolgok-2-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-791 / KR | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jong Ho Kukdong Apt.10-1301 Gwangjang-dong, Gwangjin-gu 143-751, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Hae Weon Hampton court 701-ho 1428-1, Seocho 1-dong, Seocho-gu 137-864, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Song, Hue Sup No.77-70, Sinchang-dong, Yongsan-gu 140-060, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Joo Sun Hugokmaeul 208-1704, No.1046 Ilsan-dong, Ilsan-gu 411-310, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Son, Ji Won Kwahakja Apt. C-305 Korea Institute of Science & technology, No.39-1 Hawolgok-2-dong, Seongbuk-gu 136-130, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Kim, Hae Ryoung KIST Apt. B-303 39-1 Hawolgok-dong Seongbuk-gu 136-130, Seoul / KR | 07 /
Jung, Hwa Young Chonmaeul Villa B-203, No.679-4 Hakik-1-dong Nam-gu 402-041, Incheon / KR | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
Lee, Jong Ho Kukdong Apt.10-1301 Gwangjang-dong, Gwangjin-gu 143-751, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Hae Weon Hampton court 701-ho 1428-1, Seocho 1-dong, Seocho-gu 137-864, Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Song, Hue Sup No.77-70, Sinchang-dong, Yongsan-gu 140-060, Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Joo Sun Hugokmaeul 208-1704, No.1046, Ilsan-dong, Ilsan-gu 411-310, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Son, Ji Won Kwahakja Apt. C-305, Korea Institute of Science & technology, No.39-1 Hawolgok-2-dong, Seongbuk-gu 136-130, Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Hae Ryoung KIST Apt. B-303 39-1 Hawolgok-dong Seongbuk-gu 136-130, Seoul / KR | |||
07 /
Jung, Hwa Young Chonmaeul Villa B-203, No.679-4, Hakik-1-dong, Nam-gu 402-041, Incheon / KR | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08159614.0 | 03.07.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | KR20070067286 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070067286 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2012381 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2012381 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/88, H01M4/86 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H01M4/8621 (EP,US);
H01M4/88 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G45/1264 (EP,US);
C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/62805 (EP,US);
C04B35/62815 (EP,US);
C04B35/62823 (EP,US);
C04B35/62886 (EP,US);
C04B35/62892 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C04B35/63488 (EP,US);
H01M4/8885 (EP,US);
H01M4/9025 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (KR);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3246 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3267 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M4/9033 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y10T29/1194 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | Elektrodenelektrolyt-Verbundstoffpartikel für eine Brennstoffzelle und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/02] | English: | Electrode-Electrolyte Composite Particles for a Fuel Cell and Method for the Preparation thereof | [2009/02] | French: | Particules composites électrode-électrolyte pour une pile à combustible et son procédé de préparation | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 18.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2008 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | IE | 03.07.2012 | LU | 03.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 03.07.2012 | ||
LU | 03.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 03.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 03.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 03.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6187157 (CHEN CHIEH-CHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 4 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]US6332964 (CHEN CHIEH CHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 29-53 * * column 6, lines 39-65 * * column 8, lines 40-45 * * column 17, lines 24-49 * * example II *; | [A]US2003027033 (SEABAUGH MATTHEW M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claim - * * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] *; | [A]US2004043282 (KELLEY RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure - ** paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | KR20000008664 | KR20000013388 |