13.07.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
04.08.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
29.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.02.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
26.03.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
24.03.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.01.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.07.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
19.12.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
19.12.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |