EP2017727 - Computer having flash memory and method of operating flash memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [2017/31] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Byung Yoon A-301, Jinhung Villa, 941-4 Siheung 3-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-861 / KR | [2017/36] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Choi, Byung Yoon A-301, Jinhung Villa, 941-4 Siheung 3-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-861 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2009/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160395.3 | 15.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | KR20070072433 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070072433 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017727 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017727 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017727 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G06F9/4401 (EP,US);
G06F9/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2017/36] |
Former [2010/17] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Computer mit Flash-Speicher und Verfahren zum Betrieb des Flash-Speichers | [2009/04] | English: | Computer having flash memory and method of operating flash memory | [2009/04] | French: | Ordinateur doté d'une mémoire flash et procédé de fonctionnement de la mémoire flash | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 23.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.09.2017 | [2018/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5860083 (SUKEGAWA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-24 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 27 * * column 6, line 19 - line 26 * * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 10 * * column 11, line 31 - line 42 *; | [A]EP1804169 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] *; | [A]US7054990 (TAMURA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 20 * |