EP2146174 - Ammunition retainer apparatus for an ammunition box or magazine for linked ammunition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kongsberg Defence & Aerospace AS Kirkegardsveien 45 3616 Kongsberg / NO | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulveraker, Vidar Borghild Spitens vei 17 NO - 3610 Kongsberg / NO | 02 /
Lokken, Nils Stalsbergs gate 5 NO 3612 Konsberg / NO | 03 /
Stenmo, Benny A. Sophus Lies vei 13 NO-3612 Konsberg / NO | [2011/06] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Ulveraker, Vidar Borghild Spltens vei 17 NO - 3610 Kongsberg / NO | ||
02 /
Lökken, Nils Stalsbergs gate 5 NO 3612 Konsberg / NO | |||
03 /
Stenmo, Benny A. Sophus Lies vei 13 NO-3612 Konsberg / NO | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 6963 St. Olavs plass 0130 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2010/03] | Wesmann, Johan Fredrik Zacco Norway AS Patent Department Haakon Vll's gt. 2 P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 08160702.0 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146174 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146174 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F41A9/79 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
F41A9/79 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Extension states | AL | 11.02.2009 | BA | 11.02.2009 | MK | 11.02.2009 | Title | German: | Munitionshaltevorrichtung für eine Munitionskiste oder ein Munitionsmagazin für verbundene Munition | [2010/03] | English: | Ammunition retainer apparatus for an ammunition box or magazine for linked ammunition | [2010/03] | French: | Appareil de rétention de munitions pour boîte ou chargeur de munitions pour munitions liées | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | BE | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | HR | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | IT | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | MT | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | IE | 18.07.2011 | LU | 18.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.02.2011 | |
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2710561 (DOWD ALBERT A) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1,3-5 * * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2, line 24 - line 54 * * column 3, line 5 - line 47 *; | [A]US2811084 (JACK COOK FREDERICK, et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,3-6 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 22 *; | [AD]US4972758 (AUSTIN PAUL A [US], et al) [AD] * abstract ** column 3, line 37 - line 59 *; | [A]US4974490 (AUSTIN PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 51 * | by applicant | US2452545 | US2710561 | US2874615 | US3461774 | US3580131 | US4009638 | US4213376 | US4393746 | US4433609 | US4610191 | US4972258 | EP0430565 | US6164180 |