EP2147912 - Styrylquinolines, their process of preparation and their therapeutic uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioAlliance Pharma 49, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soma, Emilienne 3, rue Fagon, Appartement 44 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Thibault, Laurent 37, allée des Chevreuils 91330 Yerres / FR | 03 /
Michaut, Mathieu 109, route Burkel 67400 Illkirch / FR | 04 /
Wermuth, Camille, Georges 3, rue de la Côté d'Azur 67100 Strasbourg / FR | 05 /
Giethlen, Bruno 12, route des Romains 67120 Altorf / FR | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08161000.8 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147912 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/14, A61K31/47, A61P31/18 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C07D215/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Styrylchinoline, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und therapeutische Anwendungen | [2010/04] | English: | Styrylquinolines, their process of preparation and their therapeutic uses | [2010/04] | French: | Styrylquinolines, leur procédé de préparation et leurs utilisations thérapeutiques | [2010/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006129134 (BIOALLIANCE PHARMA [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 10, lines 24, 27;; page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 13; claims 3,4 *; | [X]DE1902595 (SOC D ETUDES PROD CHIMIQUE) [X] 1-7 * page 2, 1st paragraph; page 4, lines 3,4 and initial product of example 2 *; | [X] - LEONARD ET AL, "Exploring molecular shape analysis of styrylquinoline derivatives as HIV-1 integrase inhibitors", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (20080101), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 81 - 92, XP022423016 [X] 1-15 * page 82, paragraph before "2. Materials and methods"; compounds 2-23,35,36, especially compound 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2007.02.021 | [X] - XIAO-HUI MA ET AL, "Exploring binding mode for styrylquinoline HIV-1 integrase inhibitors using comparative molecular field analysis and docking studies", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA, (2004), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 950 - 958, XP009109792 [X] 1-15 * page 951, 1st full paragraph; table 2, compound SQ21 * | [X] - PODESZWA ET AL, "Investigating the antiproliferative activity of quinoline-5,8-diones and styrylquinolinecarboxylic acids on tumor cell lines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20071012), vol. 17, no. 22, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 6138 - 6141, XP022297113 [X] 1-15 * page 6141, 2nd paragraph;;; examples 16,28,30,31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.09.040 | [X] - ZOUHIRI F ET AL, "HIV-1 replication inhibitors of the styrylquinoline class: introduction of an additional carboxyl group at the C-5 position of the quinoline", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (20050328), vol. 46, no. 13, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 2201 - 2205, XP004846709 [X] 1-15 * page 2201, right column, 1st complete paragraph; table 1 (p. 2203), compound 3b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2005.02.033 | [X] - ZOUHIRI F ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS AND BINDING MODE OF STYRYLQUINOLINES AS POTENT INHIBITORS OF HIV-1 INTEGRASE AND REPLICATION OF HIV-1 IN CELL CULTURE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (20000101), vol. 43, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1533 - 1540, XP000926747 [X] 1-15 * page 1533, right column, end of paragraph; table 1, compound 29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990467o | [X] - J. POLANSKI ET AL, "fragment based approach for the investigation of HIV-1 integrase inhibition", LETTERS IN DRUG DESIGN & DISCOVERY, (2007), vol. 4, pages 99 - 105, XP009109802 [X] 1-15 * table 1, compounds 15, 16a, 16b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/157018007779422532 | by applicant | WO9845269 | - POMMIER Y, NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2005), vol. 4, pages 236 - 248 | - JOHNSON AA ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 893 - 901 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, CRC PRESS, INC., (1995), vol. 1996, pages 2 - 25 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985), page 1418 | - MEEK ET AL., CHEM. ENGINEERING, (1969), vol. 14, pages 388 - 391 | - PRZYSTAL ET AL., J.HETEROCYD. CHEM, (1967), vol. 4, pages 131 - 2 |