EP2020514 - Joint and/or storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunneke, Hans-Gerd Riedenstrasse 6 49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | 02 /
Lösche, Christian Am Ostenberg 12 32351 Stemwede / DE | 03 /
Schmudde, Werner Heeker Weg 39 49593 Bersenbrück / DE | [2009/06] | Application number, filing date | 08161036.2 | 24.07.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | DE20071035654 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007035654 | [2009/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020514 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2020514 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, B62D49/00, F16D3/84, F16J3/04, F16J15/52 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
F16C11/0671 (EP,US);
B60G7/005 (EP,US);
F16J3/043 (EP,US);
B60G2204/416 (EP,US);
F16C2326/05 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/06] | F16C11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Title | German: | Gelenk- und/oder Lageranordnung | [2009/06] | English: | Joint and/or storage device | [2009/06] | French: | Agencement d'articulation et/ou de stockage | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/38] | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE1604418 (MERKEL ASBEST & GUMMIWERKE) [I] 1-14 * pages 1, 4, 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0347061 (KEEPER KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,11-14 * page 2, line 6 - line 19 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 6 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5145191 (STEWART TODD B [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,11-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10249073 (ZF LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,11,13,14* the whole document * | by applicant | US5145191 | DE10249073 |