EP2053313 - Combustors with igniters having protrusions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanson, Amy T. 16915 N. 69th Lane Peoria, AZ 85382 / US | 02 /
Pardington, Ronald B. 1777 W. Redfield Road Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08161122.0 | 24.07.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | US20070925347 | 26.10.2007 Original published format: US 925347 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053313 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/60, F23R3/50 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
F23R3/60 (EP,US);
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbrenner mit Vorsprüngen aufweisenden Anzündern | [2009/18] | English: | Combustors with igniters having protrusions | [2009/18] | French: | Chambres de combustion avec allumeurs disposant de pertubérances | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 05.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |