EP2154271 - Apparatus for growing III-nitride-bulk crystals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/07] | Method and apparatus for growing III-nitride-bulk crystals | ||
[2012/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungsverbund Berlin E.V. Rudower Chaussee 17 12489 Berlin / DE | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fornari, Roberto, Prof. Dr. / Büchnerweg 46 12489 Berlin / DE | [2012/30] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
Fornari, Roberto, Prof. Dr. Büchnerweg 46 12489 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Gulde, Klaus W., et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Gulde, Klaus W., et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde, Hengelhaupt, Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161254.1 | 28.07.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154271 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154271 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/14, C30B29/40, C23C16/455, C23C16/448, C23C16/34 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
C30B25/14 (EP);
C23C14/0021 (EP);
C23C14/0617 (EP);
C23C14/243 (EP);
C30B29/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Züchtung von III-Nitrid-Volumen-Kristallen | [2012/10] | English: | Apparatus for growing III-nitride-bulk crystals | [2012/10] | French: | Dispositif pour la croissance de cristaux de III-nitrure volumineux | [2012/10] |
Former [2010/07] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Züchtung von III-Nitrid-Volumen-Kristallen | ||
Former [2010/07] | Method and apparatus for growing III-nitride-bulk crystals | ||
Former [2010/07] | Dispositif et procédé pour la croissance de cristaux de III-nitrure volumineux | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2008 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | IT | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | IE | 28.07.2012 | LU | 28.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 28.07.2012 | ||
LU | 28.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 28.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 28.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 28.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | |
NO | 25.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - ATTOLINI G ET AL, "A vertical reactor for deposition of gallium nitride", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (20001016), vol. 66, no. 2-3, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 213 - 218, XP002502840 [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0254-0584(00)00327-8 | [X] - CAI ET AL, "Thermodynamic and kinetic study of transport and reaction phenomena in gallium nitride epitaxy growth", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEAT AND MASS TRANSFER, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (20080118), vol. 51, no. 5-6, ISSN 0017-9310, pages 1264 - 1280, XP022490264 [X] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijheatmasstransfer.2007.12.004 | [Y] - SICHE ET AL, "Growth of GaN crystals from chlorine-free gas phase", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080124), vol. 310, no. 5, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 916 - 919, XP022492823 [Y] 15-17 * paragraph [03.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2007.11.135 | [Y] - HUAQIANG WU ET AL, "Thick GaN layer grown by Ga vapor transport technique", HIGH PERFORMANCE DEVICES, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE LESTER EASTMAN CONFE RENCE ON RENSSELAER POLYTECHNIC INST., TROY, NY, USA 4-6 AUG., 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040804), ISBN 978-981-256-196-1, pages 121 - 125, XP010857766 [Y] 15-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LECHPD.2004.1549682 | [A] - SYTNIEWSKI L J ET AL, "CFD optimisation of up-flow vertical HVPE reactor for GaN growth", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 310, no. 14, ISSN 0022-0248, (20080701), pages 3358 - 3365, (20080418), XP022715399 [A] 1-17 * page 3359, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2008.04.017 | by applicant | - MADAR R ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (1975), vol. 31, page 197 | - KARPINSKI ET AL., MATER. RES. SOC. SYMP. PROC, (1984), vol. 22, pages 73 - 76 | - POROWSKI S ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (1997), vol. 178, page 174 | - KAWAMURA F ET AL., JPN J. APPL. PHYS., (2003), vol. 42, page L879 | - HUSSY S ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2008), vol. 310, page 738 | - YOSHIKAWA A ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2004), vol. 260, page 67 | - HASHIMOTO T ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2007), vol. 6, page 568 | - SONG ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2003), vol. 247, page 275 | - SHIN T I ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2006), vol. 292, page 216 | - KAMLER G ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2000), vol. 212, page 39 | - SHIBATA T ET AL., J. CRYSTAL GROWTH, (1998), vol. 189-190, page 67 | - HASEGAWA ET AL., PHYS. STAT. SOL., (1999), vol. A 176, page 421 | - MISKYS C R ET AL., PHYS. STAT. SOL., (2003), vol. C 6, page 1627 | - LUCZNIK ET AL., PHYS. STAT. SOL., (2006), vol. C 3, page 1453 |