EP2048375 - Supporting bracket and nut holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buresuto Kogyo Co., Ltd. 3-3, Chuo 1-chome Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/23] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Buresuto Kogyo Co. Ltd. 3-3, Chuo 1-chome Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugaya, Keiichi c/o Buresuto Kogyo Co., Ltd. 3-3, Chuo 1-chome Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kato, Junichi c/o Buresuto Kogyo Co., Ltd. 3-3, Chuo 1-chome Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Huebner, Stefan Rolf, et al Sr Huebner & Kollegen Prinzregentenplatz 11 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Huebner, Stefan Rolf, et al SR Huebner & Kollegen Prinzregentenplatz 11 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Huebner, Stefan Rolf Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161367.1 | 29.07.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | JP20070261878 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007261878 | JP20080131126 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008131126 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2048375 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2048375 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048375 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/06, F16B39/10 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
F16B2/065 (EP);
F16B37/044 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | F16B2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | Stützklammer und Mutternhalter | [2009/16] | English: | Supporting bracket and nut holder | [2009/16] | French: | Accessoire de support et support d'écrou | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 22.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HR | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | IT | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | MT | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | IE | 29.07.2011 | LU | 29.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | NO | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.07.2011 | ||
LU | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.07.2011 | ||
LU | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.07.2011 | ||
LU | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
NO | 08.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01129409U (NA) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]JPH01173220U (NA) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]JPS61146613U (NA) [X] 2,4 * figures 14,15 *; | [A]JPH0874375 (BURESUTO KOGYO KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US6027293 (BEEMER ANDREW PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4570885 (HEATH RICHARD W [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |