EP2028544 - Colored photosensitive composition, color filter, and method for manufacturing color filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takakuwa, Hideki@c/o Fujifilm Corporation No. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka Shizuoka 421-0302 / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Kazuto@c/o Fujifilm Corporation No. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka Shizuoka 421-0302 / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
Takakuwa, Hideki c/o Fujifilm Corporation No. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka Shizuoka 421-0302 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimada, Kazuto c/o Fujifilm Corporation No. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka Shizuoka 421-0302 / JP | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08161988.4 | 07.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | JP20070216356 | 22.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007216356 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028544 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2028544 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028544 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03F7/033, G03F7/038 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/004 (KR);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/028 (KR);
G03F7/033 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0388 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Gefärbte lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung, Farbfilter und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Farbfilters | [2009/09] | English: | Colored photosensitive composition, color filter, and method for manufacturing color filter | [2009/09] | French: | Composition photosensible colorée, filtre couleur, et procédé de fabrication du filtre couleur | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 22.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2008 | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | ES | 23.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1505441 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2007099096 (SASAKI TOMOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2008081988 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-11 * page 147; example 21; table 3 * * page 138, paragraph 265 * * page 139, paragraph 266 * * Exemplified compound 15; page 50 * * pages 4-5, paragraph 10 * * pages 139-140, paragraph 267 * | by applicant | US2367660 | US2367661 | US2367670 | US2448828 | US2722512 | US2951758 | US3046127 | US3549367 | JPS4864183 | JPS4841708B | JPS4943191B | JPS506034B | JPS5137193 | JPS5148516B | JPS5230490B | US4808501 | JPS6490403 | JPS6491102 | JPH0194301 | JPH02199403 | US5059500 | JPH05333207 | JPH0611614 | JPH0635183 | JPH0651115 | JPH06194828 | JP2592207B | US5667920 | JP2000080068 | JP2001233842 | JP2003262958 | JP2003335814 | JP2006243040 | JP3823579B | JP2006276878 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 |