EP2028240 - Phase change ink compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/09] | Phase Change Ink Compositions | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odell, Peter G. 1855 Balsam Avenue Mississauga Ontario L5J 1L3 / CA | 02 /
Belelie, Jennifer L. 1320 Ridgebank Drive Oakville Ontario L6M 4A5 / CA | 03 /
Mahabadi, Hadi K. 2660 Speakman Drive Mississauga Ontario L5K 2L1 / CA | 04 /
Wagner, Christopher A. 28 Gold Crest Road Etobicoke Ontario M9A 1L3 / CA | 05 /
Allen, C Geoffrey 8 Heathfield Crescent Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H5 / CA | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08162043.7 | 07.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | US20070890719 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: US 890719 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028240 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028240 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/34, C09D11/101 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (KR);
B41J2/01 (KR);
B41M5/00 (KR);
C09D11/34 (EP,US);
Y10S522/908 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | C09D11/00, C09D11/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/06] |
Former [2009/09] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen für Phasenwechseltinten | [2009/09] | English: | Phase change ink compositions | [2016/01] | French: | Compositions de changement de phase pour encre | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/09] | Phase Change Ink Compositions | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1642944 (COATES BROTHERS [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; example - *; | [X]WO2007025893 (OCE TECH BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0034]; example -; claim - *; | [DX]US2007120910 (ODELL PETER G [CA], et al) [DX] 1-15 * paragraph [0111]; example -; claim - *; | [DX]US2007123606 (TOMA ENIKO [CA], et al) [DX] 1-15 * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116]; example -; claim - *; | [DX]US2007123723 (ODELL PETER G [CA], et al) [DX] 1-15* paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116]; example -; claim - * | by applicant | US3653932 | US4390369 | US4484948 | EP0187352 | EP0206286 | US4684956 | US4851045 | US4889560 | US4889761 | US5006170 | US5151120 | US5195430 | US5221335 | DE4205636 | DE4205713 | WO9404619 | US5372852 | US5389958 | US5496879 | US5621022 | US6547380 | US2007120910 | US2007123606 | US2007120925 | US7259275 | US7279587 | US2008000384 | - "Dimer Acids", KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (1992), vol. 8, pages 223 - 237 | - JIKEI ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 33, pages 6228 - 6234 |