Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
03.10.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.08.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
16.04.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.04.2012 | First examination report | |
03.04.2012 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
27.01.2012 | Change - representative | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
14.01.2012 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | |
13.01.2012 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
13.01.2012 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.12.2011 | Definitive list of designations | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
21.12.2011 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.09.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
01.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
15.04.2011 | Change - classification | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
26.11.2010 | Change - classification | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
31.08.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.01.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |