Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009049205 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20070082941 | 17.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090018471 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20070082941 | 17.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2026574 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2026574 | 18.02.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20070082941 | 17.08.2007 |