EP2030934 - Device for driving one or more superimposed bands for rotary press and rotary press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss Systemes Graphiques Nantes 20, rue de Koufra 44300 Nantes / FR | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLECULEE, Cyrille 11, rue des Volubilis 44840, Les Sorinières / FR | 02 /
GRIFFON, Michel 1, Le Quarteron 44190, Gorges / FR | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08162749.9 | 21.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | FR20070057191 | 27.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0757191 | [2009/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030934 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030934 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
B65H45/221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport eines oder mehrerer übereinander angeordneter Bänder für Rundlaufpresse und entsprechende Rundlaufpresse | [2009/10] | English: | Device for driving one or more superimposed bands for rotary press and rotary press | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement d'une ou plusieurs bandes superposées pour presse rotative et presse rotative | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 17.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | LU | 21.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | NO | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
LU | 21.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
LU | 21.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004050895 (ZWEIFEL HANS [CH], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0026] , [0036]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007057005 (THEILACKER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0022] , [0024] , [0027] , [0028]; figure - * |