Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4426609B | Global Dossier | 03.03.2010 | B2 | JP2009052834 | 12.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007221094 | 28.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4430697B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2010 | B2 | JP2009052831 | 12.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007221088 | 28.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2031320 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2012 | B1 | EP2031320 | 04.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007221088 | 28.08.2007 | JP2007221094 | 28.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101377332B | 18.08.2010 | B | CN101377332 | 04.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007221088 | 28.08.2007 | JP2007221094 | 28.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2392366T | 10.12.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2007221088 | 28.08.2007 | JP2007221094 | 28.08.2007 |