EP2031320 - Air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Uehara, Nobuaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Naoya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
Nakagawa, Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
Yoshikawa, Toshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
Tanigawa, Yoshinori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 07 /
Hirakawa, Seiji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/41] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Ishikawa, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
Uehara, Nobuaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Naoya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakagawa, Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
05 /
Yoshikawa, Toshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
06 /
Tanigawa, Yoshinori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
07 /
Hirakawa, Seiji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08162940.4 | 26.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | JP20070221088 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007221088 | JP20070221094 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007221094 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031320 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031320 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, F24F1/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F1/0057 (EP);
F24F13/1426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage | [2009/10] | English: | Air conditioner | [2009/10] | French: | Climatiseur | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 05.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH03158647 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2554216 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0657701 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1271065 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH03158647 |