EP2000587 - Dewatering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherb, Thomas Rua Itapaiuna 1800 AP 202 Jd. Morumbi 05707-001, Sao Paulo - SP / BR | 02 /
Silva, Luiz Carlos Rua Victory Savoia, 46, Vila Tavares 13230-000, CAMPO LIMPO, SP / BR | 03 /
Herman, Jeffrey 42 Derwen Road BALA CYNWYD, PA, PA 19004 / US | 04 /
Walkenhaus, Hubert Nachtigallenweg 38 50169, Kerpen / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Scherb, Thomas R. Nilza de Medeiros Martins, 200, ap.81, bl.6 Jd CEP 05628010, Sao Paulo - SP / BR | ||
02 /
Silva, Luiz Carlos Rua Victory Savoia, 46, Vila Tavares 13230-000, CAMPO LIMPO, SP / BR | |||
03 /
Herman, Jeffrey 42 Derwen Road BALA CYNWYD, PA, PA 19004 / US | |||
04 /
Walkenhaus, Hubert Nachtigallenweg 38 50169, Kerpen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08163021.2 | 19.01.2005 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | US20040768423 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 768423 | US20040580663P | 17.06.2004 Original published format: US 580663 P | US20040581500P | 21.06.2004 Original published format: US 581500 P | US20040972408 | 26.10.2004 Original published format: US 972408 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2000587 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000587 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00, D21F3/02, D21F7/08, D21F1/00, D21F1/48 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
D21F1/0036 (EP,US);
D21F1/0063 (EP,US);
D21F1/0072 (EP,US);
D21F1/48 (EP,US);
D21F3/0209 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | D21F11/00, D21F3/02, D21F7/08, D21F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwässerungssystem | [2008/50] | English: | Dewatering system | [2008/50] | French: | Système d'égouttage | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05701545.5 / EP1709242 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050701545) is 15.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2005 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | GB | 19.01.2018 | IE | 19.01.2018 | LU | 19.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.01.2005 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO03062528 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-7,17-20,26,35,38,40-42,49,51-55,62-65,73-84 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 17, paragraph 4 * * page 23, paragraph 3 - page 31, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,3,5,6 *; | [X]US5701682 (CHUANG STRONG C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,20,26,31,32,35,38,42,51,55,59-69,73,77-85 * column 4, line 32 - column 12, line 14 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2003033727 (STELLJES MICHAEL GOMER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,16-20,22-28,35-38,62-64,73,74,77-79,84 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US2003056925 (BECK DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-7,17-20,26,32,38,42,51,55,59-61,65,69,73,74,77-79,84 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,6 *; | [X]US6051105 (AMPULSKI ROBERT STANLEY [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,14,20,26,29,30,32-41,59-64,69,72,73,75,77 * column 9, line 36 - column 12, line 56 *; | [X]US6149767 (HERMANS MICHAEL ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,20,26,38,73,74,77-79,84-86 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 16 * * column 9, line 32 - line 56 * * column 11, line 11 - column 19, line 27 *; | [X]US6436240 (JEFFREY JOHN [GB]) [X] 56 * column 1, line 24 - line 60 * * column 2, line 6 - line 23 *; | [XY]EP1293602 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 57 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 58; | [X]EP0878579 (APPLETON MILLS [US]) [X] 57 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 13 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US4162190 (ASHWORTH GORDON [GB]) [Y] 58 * column 7, line 14 - line 19 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO03062528 | US2003136018 | US6454904 | US6096169 | US6237644 | US4440597 | US2006086473 | US2005167068 |