EP2065640 - Gas temperature control apparatus for denox boiler in engine cogeneration plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 102 Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyouck-ju 115-803 Mockyangmaeul Apt., Mock-dong Jung-gu Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Park, Hwa-choon 104-1302 EXPO Apt., jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Chung, Dae-hun 404 Daewoo 5cha, 111-18 Chungdam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Choi, Jae-joon 111-1402 Hanbit Apt., Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08163065.9 | 27.08.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | KR20070114986 | 12.11.2007 Original published format: KR 20070114986 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2065640 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2065640 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F22B35/00, F22B1/18, F22B7/02, F22B7/12, F22B9/14, F01N9/00 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
F23N5/00 (KR);
F01N3/18 (KR);
F22B9/14 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | F22B35/00, F22B1/18, F22B7/02, F22B7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle einer Gastemperatur für DeNox-Kessel in Heizkraftanlage | [2009/23] | English: | Gas temperature control apparatus for denox boiler in engine cogeneration plant | [2009/23] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de la température de gaz pour chaudière de dénitrification dans une installation de cogénération | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2904015 (PENNING DOUGLAS E) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4160009 (HAMABE KO HEI) [A] 1-3 * figure 3 * | by applicant | US5022226 | KR0164291B | KR19980051022 |