Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
05.11.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.10.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.09.2014 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
24.01.2014 | Change - representative | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
24.01.2014 | Change - representative | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
17.01.2014 | Change - classification | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
17.01.2014 | Change - classification | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
20.09.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.02.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |