EP2039728 - Red paint mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michaelis, Stephan Mutzbroicher Str. 15a 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Berneth, Horst Erfurter Str. 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Kuckert, Eberhard Kuhlmannweg 35 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/18] | Application number, filing date | 08163756.3 | 05.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | DE20071044743 | 18.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007044743 | DE20081023114 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023114 | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039728 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039728 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039728 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B1/54, C09B1/467, C08J3/22, C08K5/00, C09B1/00 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
C09B67/0051 (EP,US);
C07C217/94 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C09B1/005 (EP,US);
C09B1/467 (EP,US);
C09B1/545 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09B67/0041 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | C09B67/22, C09B1/54, C09B1/467, C08J3/22, C08K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | Rote Farbstoffmischung | [2009/13] | English: | Red paint mixture | [2009/13] | French: | Mélange de couleur rouge | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | CY | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | HR | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | NO | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | IE | 05.09.2012 | LU | 05.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | |
NO | 02.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS123304 (V.MATOUS, V.ZVERINA) [A] 14* compound II *; | [X]EP0546856 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 14-15,18 * table 15 *; | [X]EP0564237 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 14-15,18 * table 6 *; | [A]DE4241116 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5332404 (HIMENO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * col.5,Farbst.12; Beispiel 109 mit Farbst. H;;; table 15 *; | [X]EP0621320 (HOECHST MITSUBISHI KASEI [JP]) [X] 1,4,8 * Farbst.(1), Farbst. (V);; tables 1-4 *; | [XY]US5578419 (ITOH HISATO [JP], et al) [X] 14-15,18 * table 15 * * the whole document * [Y] 14-20; | [X]DE19533026 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * Tab.1:Farbst.2,4,8; Tab.3:Farbst.12; Tab.5:MIschungen2/12;4/12;8/12 *; | [X]DE19623411 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * Tabelle 4, Mischung 45, 47 *; | [XY]CN1597788 (DALIAN UNIV OF SCIENCE & TECHN [CN]) [X] 14-15,17 * examples 1,3,4 * [Y] 14-20 |