EP2161024 - Combination product for the treatment of cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Hamburg-Eppendorf Martinistraße 52 20246 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Hamburg-Eppendorf Martinistrasse 52 20246 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumacher, Udo Am Haidberg 6 21465 Wentorf / DE | 02 /
Eschenhagen, Thomas Müggenkampstrasse 31 20257 Hamburg / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08163829.8 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161024 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/40, A61K31/366, A61P35/00 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/366 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kombinationspräparat zur Behandlung von Krebs | [2010/10] | English: | Combination product for the treatment of cancer | [2010/10] | French: | Combinaison pour le traitement de cancer | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005281868 (LANE EDWARD M [US]) [X] 1-7,12-15 * paragraph [0059]; example 2 *; | [AD]US2006009506 (WESTWICK JOHN K [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * table 2 *; | [A] - ISHIKAWA MASAAKI ET AL, "Reversal of acquired resistance to doxorubicin in K562 human leukemia cells by astemizole", BIOLOGICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (200001), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 112 - 115, XP002514903 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US5273995 | US5502199 | US4346227 | US4231938 | US4739073 | US5260440 | US4444784 | EP1491193 | EP1714648 | WO2006017185 | - KAMAT; NELKIN, UROLOGY, (2005), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 1209 - 12 | - RAO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1998), vol. 17, no. 18, pages 2393 - 402 | - MÜHLHÄUSER ET AL., FASEB JOURNAL, (2006), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 785 - 787 |