EP2161028 - Food product comprising dipeptides having antihypertensive properties. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/10] | Composition comprising peptides | ||
[2010/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Buren, Leendert c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Foltz, Martin c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
Ramcharan, Jane Rita c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Corsten, Michael Allan, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Corsten, Michael Allan, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08163907.2 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161028 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161028 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/05, A61P9/12, A23L1/305 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/05 (EP);
A23C19/0921 (EP);
A23C9/1322 (EP);
A23C9/1526 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23L2/02 (EP);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/18 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2250/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | A61K38/05, A61P9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittel enthaltend Dipeptide mit blutdrucksenkenden Eigenschaften. | [2010/26] | English: | Food product comprising dipeptides having antihypertensive properties. | [2010/26] | French: | Aliment contenant dipeptides des propriétés antihypertensives. | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/10] | Zusammensetzung, die Peptide umfasst | ||
Former [2010/10] | Composition comprising peptides | ||
Former [2010/10] | Composition comprenant des peptides | Examination procedure | 23.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | HR | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | LT | 05.01.2011 | LV | 05.01.2011 | MT | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | NO | 05.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | IS | 05.05.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | IE | 09.09.2011 | LU | 09.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
HR | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 05.01.2011 | |
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | HR | 05.01.2011 | |
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NO | 05.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0821968 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 40 - line 48 * * page 3, line 33 - line 49 *; | [A]US6060452 (GREEN LAWRENCE R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 21 * * column 5, line 45 - line 50 ** column 7, line 14 - line 15 *; | [A]WO2006084560 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - line 28 * * page 10, line 21 - line 29 *; | [A]EP1726659 (HANSENS LAB [DK]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * columns 4,6,9 * * columns 16,27 - column 31 * | by applicant | - GERSTEIN ET AL., THE LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 253 - 259 | - HATA, Y ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1996), vol. 64, pages 767 - 771 | - VAN PLATERINK CJ ET AL., "Quantification of ACE inhibiting peptides in human plasma using high performance liquid chromatography-mass spectrometry", J CHROMATOGR B ANALYT TECHNOL BIOMED LIFE SCI, (2006), vol. 830, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jchromb.2005.10.036, pages 151 - 157, XP025122364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2005.10.036 | - VAN PLATERINK CJ; JANSSEN HG; HAVERKAMP J, "Development of an at-line method for the identification of angiotensin-I inhibiting peptides in protein hydrolysates", J CHROMATOGR B ANALYT TECHNOL BIOMED LIFE SCI, (2007), vol. 846, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jchromb.2006.08.052, pages 147 - 154, XP005862585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2006.08.052 | - HELLBERG S ET AL., "Peptide Quantitative Structure-Activity-Relationships, A Multivariate Approach", J MED CHEM, (1987), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00390a003, pages 1126 - 1135, XP000877494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00390a003 |