EP2161488 - A pipe section assembly for use in a submerged pipeline system, the submerged pipeline system and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/10] | A pipe section for use in a submerged pipeline system, the submerged pipeline system and the use thereof | ||
[2012/25] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heerema Fabrication Group B.V. 8, Noordweg 3336 LH Zwijndrecht / NL | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greveling, Marinus 44, Bremere 4724 HE Wouw / NL | 02 /
Klaver, Jan-Pieter 35, Voorstraat 4797 BE Willemstad / NL | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08163971.8 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161488 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/06, F16L1/16 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
F16L1/161 (EP,US);
F16L47/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Rohrabschnittanordnung zur Verwendung in einem Unterwasserrohrleitungsystem, Unterwasserrohrleitungsystem und Verwendung davon | [2012/25] | English: | A pipe section assembly for use in a submerged pipeline system, the submerged pipeline system and the use thereof | [2012/25] | French: | Assemblage de section de tuyau pour une utilisation dans un système de conduites submergées, système de conduites submergées et son utilisation | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/10] | Rohrabschnitt zur Verwendung in einem Unterwasserpipelinesystem, Unterwasserpipelinesystem und Verwendung davon | ||
Former [2010/10] | A pipe section for use in a submerged pipeline system, the submerged pipeline system and the use thereof | ||
Former [2010/10] | Section de tuyau pour une utilisation dans un système de conduites submergées, système de conduites submergées et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008143104 (LOGAN ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0059]; figure - * | by applicant | WO0140695 | WO0196771 | RU2149304 | BE1013453 |