EP2037576 - Method of automatically adapting the impedance of a radiofrequency circuit and emission or reception instrumentation with automatic adaptation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Commissariat A L'Energie Atomique - CEA 25 Rue Leblanc, Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan Wai Po, Francis 6 rue Charrel 38100 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
De Foucauld, Emeric 160 avenue Victor Hugo 38170 SEYSSINET / FR | 03 /
Vincent, Pierre Route des Clots 38250 VILLARD DE LANS / FR | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2009/12] | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08164092.2 | 10.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | FR20070006360 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0706360 | [2009/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037576 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037576 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037576 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H03H7/40, H03F3/24, H03F1/56 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H03H7/40 (EP,US);
H03F1/56 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H04B1/0458 (EP,US);
H03F2200/378 (EP,US);
H03F2200/387 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | H03H7/40, H03F1/56, H03F3/24 | ||
Former IPC [2009/12] | H03H7/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/09] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Impedanzanpassung einer Radiofrequenzschaltung und einer Funksender- oder -empfangskette mit automatischer Anpassung | [2009/12] | English: | Method of automatically adapting the impedance of a radiofrequency circuit and emission or reception instrumentation with automatic adaptation | [2009/12] | French: | Procédé d'adaptation automatique d'impedance de circuit radiofréquence et chaîne d'emission ou réception à adaptation automatique | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 23.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.08.2014 | [2015/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1221348 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ) [X] 1-13 * column 1, lines 1-33; figure 3 *; | [X]DE1915760 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-13 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]DE1766154 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ) [X] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2573940 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]FR2715869 (SAIREM [FR]) [A] 1-13* figure 1 * | Examination | US6259334 | US2007035356 | EP1800410 | by applicant | US4375051 |