Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
03.05.2013 | Change - representative | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
01.03.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.02.2013 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
28.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.06.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
15.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
15.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
29.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |