EP2040303 - Light-transmitting metal electrode having hyperfine structure and process for preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsumi Eishi Intellectual Prop. Division Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Akira Intellectual Prop. Division Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Asawaka Koji Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08164584.8 | 18.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070245167 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007245167 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040303 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040303 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/18 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H01L31/022491 (EP,US);
H01B5/14 (KR);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01M14/00 (KR);
G02F1/13439 (EP,US);
H01J2211/225 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | H01L31/0224 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/43] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Licht übertragende Metallelektrode mit Hyperfeinstruktur und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2009/13] | English: | Light-transmitting metal electrode having hyperfine structure and process for preparation thereof | [2009/13] | French: | Électrode métallique électroluminescente dotée d'une structure hyperfine et son procédé de préparation | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0534467 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5-6,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 52 - column 8, line 58 *; | [A]US6198051 (MOSHREFZADEH ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 34 * * column 8, line 50 - column 11, line 33 *; | [A]US7029727 (KOKURA MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-6,8 * abstract ** paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] *; | [A]US2006112987 (NAKATA TOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2006170333 (ISHIHARA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0076] * | Examination | US2003160557 | by applicant | US6565763 | JP2005279807 | JP2005332705 | - KAGAKU JITEN, TOKYO KAGAKU DOZIN CO., LTD. | - C. HARRISON, PHYSICAL REVIEW E, (2002), vol. 66, page 011706 |