EP2027980 - Closed cooling system for tools of plastics processing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stemke Kunststofftechnik GmbH Waldheimer Strasse 1 04720 Döbeln / DE | [2010/52] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Stemke, Gudrun Waldheimerstrasse 1 04720 Döbeln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stemke, Lothar Waldheimer Straße 1 04720 Döbeln / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Steffen Mühlstraße 5 09661 Hainichen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Bauer, Steffen Albertstrasse 28 09661 Hainichen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08164946.9 | 12.05.2006 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20051021961 | 12.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005021961 | DE20051058963 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058963 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027980 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027980 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/00, B29C45/73 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B29C33/046 (EP,US);
B29C35/007 (EP,US);
B29C45/7306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Geschlossenes Kühlsystem für Werkzeuge von Kunststoffverarbeitungsmaschinen | [2009/09] | English: | Closed cooling system for tools of plastics processing machines | [2009/09] | French: | Système de refroidissement fermé pour des outils de machines transformation des plastiques | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06763133.3 / EP1888298 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IE | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2012/05] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3667248 (CARLSON ARTHUR H) [A] 1,2 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4063867 (JANNIERE ALAIN) [A] 1,5-8 * figures 1,5,25 *; | [A]US4091069 (ALLEN PAUL E) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0465214 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003039716 (MIZUKUSA YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 3 * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE19918428 |