EP2053472 - Fusing Device and Image Forming Apparatus Having the Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Chang-hoon 7-601 Gaepo Hanshin Apartment, Dogok 2-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Dong-woo 5-1309 Samik Apartment, Bangbae 3-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Tae-gyu 302-1001 Sinyeongtong Hyundai Town, Banwol-dong Taean-gu, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Shin, Su-ho 108-1502 Park Town Seoan Apartment, Sunae-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Seol, Dong-jin 1602 Seongyeong Living Villat, 1131, Ingye-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Hwan-hee 305, 32-4, Gokbanjeong-dong, Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | O'Callaghan, Robert James, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/18] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165025.1 | 24.09.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | KR20070107223 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070107223 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053472 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
G03G15/2064 (EP,KR,US);
G03G15/2053 (KR);
G03G2215/2035 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fixiervorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung damit | [2009/18] | English: | Fusing Device and Image Forming Apparatus Having the Same | [2009/18] | French: | Dispositif de fixage et dispositif de formation d'images comportant celui-ci | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 27.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006215056 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [E]EP1973011 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-14 * paragraph [0046] * * figures 2-7 *; | [E]EP2006749 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-14 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 18,19 * | Examination | JP2006251069 | by applicant | EP1973011 | EP2006749 |