Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
14.10.2016 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
26.08.2016 | Change - inventor | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
12.08.2016 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
12.08.2016 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
12.08.2016 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
03.08.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.04.2016 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.03.2016 | Change - classification | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
11.03.2016 | Change - classification | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
13.07.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.09.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.06.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
12.03.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
10.03.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.09.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
05.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.07.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |