EP2045221 - A dielectric ceramic composition and an electric device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seki, Hideaki c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Aman, Sanshiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 03 /
Miyauchi, Mari c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08165396.6 | 29.09.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | JP20070255598 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007255598 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045221 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045221 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/462, C04B35/468, H01G4/12, H01G4/30 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
C04B35/468 (KR);
C04B35/4682 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/49 (EP,US);
C04B35/62685 (EP,US);
H01G4/30 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3249 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3277 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3287 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6565 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6584 (EP,US);
C04B2235/663 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | Dielektrische Keramikzusammensetzung und elektrische Vorrichtung | [2009/15] | English: | A dielectric ceramic composition and an electric device | [2009/15] | French: | Composition de céramique diélectrique et dispositif électrique | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0992469 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * examples 1-5; claims 1-11; tables 1-10 *; | [X]JPH11260660 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XP]EP1972605 (TDK CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-3 * examples 1-6; claims 1-7; tables 1-6 *; | [T]EP2070888 (TDK CORP [JP]) [T] * examples 1-3; claims 1-6; tables 1-3 * | by applicant | JP3567759B | JP3139444B |