EP2101010 - Taper lock system and method of installing a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/38] | Taper lock system | ||
[2017/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Laurence Company, Inc. 2503 East Vernon Avenue Los Angeles, California 90058 / US | [2017/20] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states C.R. Laurence Company, Inc. 2503 East Vernon Avenue Los Angeles, California 90058-1897 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sprague, Gary 2503 East Vernon Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90058 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/40] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2009/38] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 08165681.1 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | US20080036850P | 14.03.2008 Original published format: US 36850 P | US20080119420 | 12.05.2008 Original published format: US 119420 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101010 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2101010 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2101010 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/16, E06B1/60, E06B3/54, E04F11/18 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
E06B3/5454 (EP,US);
E04F11/1851 (EP,US);
E06B3/54 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53683 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | E04F11/16, E06B1/60, E06B3/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verriegelungssystem sowie Verfahren zum Einbauen eines Paneels | [2017/16] | English: | Taper lock system and method of installing a panel | [2017/16] | French: | Système de verrouillage et procédé d'installation d'un panneau | [2017/16] |
Former [2009/38] | Kegelspannsystem | ||
Former [2009/38] | Taper lock system | ||
Former [2009/38] | Système de verrouillage conique | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2008 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 02.10.2008 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 22.11.2017 | |
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 22.11.2017 | |
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1288191 ; | [X]DE3939149 ; | [A]EP0412669 (GLAZPART LTD [GB]); | [A]AT502996 (MARSCHALL ALFRED [AT]); | [XAI]DE202007009239U (BANGRATZ RENE [DE]) | by applicant | DE3939149 | DE202007009239U |