EP2045731 - Automatic generation of ontologies using word affinities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marvit, David 815 24th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 02 /
Jain, Jawahar 1955 Quail Meadow Road Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
Stergio, Stergios 1130 Ayala Drive, Apartment 3 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Labrou, Yannis 120 Kentucky Avenue SE Washington, WA 20003 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2013/21] | Holz, Ulrike, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence Haseltine Lake 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165760.3 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | US20070977770 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: US 977770 | US20080242950 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: US 242950 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2045731 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/319 (EP,US);
G06F40/242 (EP,US);
G06F16/313 (EP,US);
G06F16/367 (EP,US);
G06F40/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/51] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatische Erzeugung von Ontologien mit Wortähnlichkeiten | [2009/15] | English: | Automatic generation of ontologies using word affinities | [2009/15] | French: | Génération automatique d'ontologies utilisant des affinités de vocabulaire | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 09.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.08.2018 | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/39] | 19.05.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 29.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6587848 (AGGARWAL CHARU C [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 28 - line 46 *; | [Y]US6847966 (SOMMER MATTHEW S [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 15 * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 6 *; | [A]US6651096 (GAI SILVANO [IT], et al) [A] 6-11 * abstract * * column 10, line 27 - line 37; figures 4,5,7 *; | [A] - BRACE K S ET AL, "Efficient implementation of a BDD package", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM / IEEE DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE. ORLANDO, JUNE 24 - 28, 1990; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM/IEEE DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE (DAC)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19900624), vol. CONF. 27, ISBN 978-0-89791-363-8, pages 40 - 45, XP010079381 [A] 6-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/123186.123222 |