EP2174706 - Apparatus and process for gas phase fluidised bed polymerisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | King, Alex Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | King, Alex Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165825.4 | 03.10.2008 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174706 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/24, C08F10/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/24 (KR);
B01J8/1809 (EP,US);
B01J8/1872 (EP,US);
C08F2/01 (KR);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/01 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Gasphasen-Wirbelschichtpolymerisation | [2010/15] | English: | Apparatus and process for gas phase fluidised bed polymerisation | [2010/15] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la polymerisation en phase gazeuse dans un lit fluidisé | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/39] | 20.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0241986 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 4, lines 17-22 * * page 8, lines 12-31; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9961485 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, lines 26-29 * * page 5, lines 7-12; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0855411 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0035] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2001037004 (DURAND DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 8, lines 13-26; figure 2 *; | [AD]US4543399 (JENKINS III JOHN M [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * column 5, lines 50-53; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4588790 | US4543399 | EP0475603 | EP1240217 | EP1484344 | EP0855411 |