|
04.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |