EP2124042 - Method for estimating fluid transport properties in porous media using computer tomographic images thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingrain, Inc 3733 Westheimer Road, Suite 200 Houston TX 77027 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wojcik, Zbigniew M. 13703 Morningbluff Dr. SAN ANTONIO TX 78216 / US | 02 /
Bosl, William J. 623 Chapman Street CANTON MA 02021 / US | 03 /
Fang, Qian 9201 Clarewood Dr., Apt. 148 HOUSTON TX 77036 / US | [2017/30] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
Wojcik, Zbigniew M. 13703 Morningbluff Dr. SAN ANTONIO TX 78216 / US | ||
02 /
Bosl, William J. 623 Chapman Street CANTON MA 02021 / US | |||
03 /
Fang, Qian 9201 Clarewood Dr., Apt. 148 HOUSTON TX 77036 / US | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08165924.5 | 06.10.2008 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | US20080124261 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: US 124261 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124042 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2124042 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/04, G06T7/00, G06K9/34 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
G01N23/046 (EP,US);
G06V10/267 (EP,US);
G01N2223/419 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NO [2017/30] |
Former [2010/30] | GB, NO | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bewertung der Durchflusseigenschaften in einem porösen Medium mithilfe von computertomographischen Bildern davon | [2009/48] | English: | Method for estimating fluid transport properties in porous media using computer tomographic images thereof | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé pour estimer des propriétés de transport de fluides dans un support poreux utilisant des images tomographiques informatiques correspondantes | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 26.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US6516080 (NUR AMOS M [US], et al) [DY] 7-12* the whole document *; | [XY] - GALLUCCI ET AL, "3D experimental investigation of the microstructure of cement pastes using synchrotron X-ray microtomography (muCT)", CEMENT AND CONCRETE RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, ELMSFORD, NY, US, (20070222), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0008-8846, pages 360 - 368, XP005900745 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * part "3.1 Qualitative analysis of the reconstructed slices", part "3.2.1. Image processing", part "3.2.3 Porosity" * * figures 3,4,6 * [Y] 7-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cemconres.2006.10.012 | [XY] - DE GRAEF B ET AL, "A sensitivity study for the visualisation of bacterial weathering of concrete and stone with computerised X-ray microtomography", SCIENCE OF THE TOTAL ENVIRONMENT, ELSEVIER, (20050401), vol. 341, no. 1-3, ISSN 0048-9697, pages 173 - 183, XP004838858 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 178 * * figures 3-5 * [Y] 7-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.scitotenv.2004.09.035 | [XY] - SIMONE BUGANI ET AL, "Investigating morphological changes in treated vs. untreated stone building materials by x-ray micro-CT", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080315), vol. 391, no. 4, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 1343 - 1350, XP019621324 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 1345, column L * * page 1346, column R * * figure 2 * * table 1 * [Y] 7-12 | [XY] - JONES ET AL, "Characterization of methane hydrate host sediments using synchrotron-computed microtomography (CMT)", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070331), vol. 56, no. 1-3, ISSN 0920-4105, pages 136 - 145, XP022011826 [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * abstract * * page 139 * * page 141 * * figures 3,5,7 * [Y] 9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.petrol.2006.03.029 | [PX] - FELIPUSSI S C ET AL, "Measuring Statistical Geometric Properties of Tomographic Images of Soils", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081101), vol. 55, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 2502 - 2512, XP011227828 [PX] 1,2,4 * page 2502 - page 2506 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6516080 | US7277795 | - LADD, "Numerical Simulations of Particulate Suspensions via a discretized Boltzmann Equation, Part 1: Theoretical Foundation", J. FLUID MECH., (1994), vol. 271, pages 285 - 309 | - GUNSTENSEN ET AL., "Lattice Boltzmann Model of Immiscible Fluids", PHYS. REV. A., (19910415), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 4320 - 4327 | - OLSEN ET AL., "Two-fluid Flow in Sedimentary Rock: Simulation, Transport and Complexity", J. FLUID MECHANICS, (1997), vol. 341, pages 343 - 370 | - GUSTENSEN ET AL., "Lattice-Boltzmann Studies of Immiscible Two-Phase Flow Through Porous Media", J. OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, (19930410), vol. 98, no. B4, pages 6431 - 6441 |