EP2071126 - Turbine blades and methods of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riahi, Ardeshir / 6803 East North Lane Scottsdale, AZ 85253 / US | 02 /
Poon, Kin / 900 W. Grove Pkwy, No. 1095 Tempe, AZ 85283 / US | 03 /
Chou, David / 3310 E. Cedarwood Lane Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 04 /
Malak, Malak F. / 9579 S. Shafer Drive Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Riahi, Ardeshir 6803 East North Lane Scottsdale, AZ 85253 / US | ||
02 /
Poon, Kin 900 W. Grove Pkwy, No. 1095 Tempe, AZ 85283 / US | |||
03 /
Chou, David 3310 E. Cedarwood Lane Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | |||
04 /
Malak, Malak F. 9579 S. Shafer Drive Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2015/47] |
Former [2009/25] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165957.5 | 06.10.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | US20070953489 | 10.12.2007 Original published format: US 953489 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071126 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071126 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071126 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D5/20, F01D5/14 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F05D2230/10 (EP,US);
F05D2230/211 (EP,US);
F05D2240/307 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/38] | F01D5/14, F01D5/20 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | F01D5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/21] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufeln und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Turbinenschaufeln | [2009/25] | English: | Turbine blades and methods of manufacturing | [2009/25] | French: | Aubes de turbine et procédé pour fabrication | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5503527 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 56 - line 61 * * column 5, line 47 - line 62 * * column 4, line 46 - line 55 *; | [Y]US2005232771 (HARVEY NEIL W [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figure 11 * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2006257257 (DESCHAMPS PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 8,9 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]GB2075129 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-8 * figures 4,5 * * page 4, line 25 - line 63 * * page 2, line 73 - line 105 *; | [A]FR2891003 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 25 - line 30 *; | [A]EP1221537 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0019] * |