EP2056248 - Electronic commerce system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Financial Inc. 195 Broadway New York, NY 10007 / US | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bremner, Todd Thomson Financial Inc. 195 Broadway New York, MA 10007 / US | 02 /
Constantine, John Boland Jr. Thomson Financial Inc. 195 Broadway New York, NY 10007 / US | 03 /
Jaminet, Paul 206 Massachusetts Avenue 1 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
Kopikis, Alexis 2000 Commonwealth Avenue, Apt. 1 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 05 /
Kuntz, Matthew 11 Vista Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | 06 /
Lamoureux, Bob 7 Lincoln Road Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 / US | 07 /
Moochhala, Zenobia 10 Isabella Street 2 Boston, MA 02216 / US | 08 /
Shea, Edward 152 Rockland Street Canton, MA 02021 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Hofmann, Harald, et al 24IP LAW GROUP Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08166292.6 | 25.10.2001 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | US20000697024 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: US 697024 | US20000696754 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: US 696754 | US20000696765 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: US 696765 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056248 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q10/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | E-Commerce-System | [2009/19] | English: | Electronic commerce system | [2009/19] | French: | Systeme de Commerce Electronique | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01990827.6 / EP1334421 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010990827) is 06.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 09.10.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2009 | 09.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2009 | 09.10.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2009 | 09.10.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2009 | 09.10.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2009 | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2009 | 31.10.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4884217 (SKEIRIK RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]US5179702 (SPIX GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9714087 (ERICKSON JOHN S [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - page 4, line 18 * * page 6, line 14 - page 11, line 17 *; | [X]US5668993 (PETERS MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - column 6, line 13 *; | [X]WO9822892 (MANGOSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 6, line 9 * * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 39 * * page 7, line 8 - page 12, line 25 *; | [X]EP0853277 (CROSSROADS SOFTWARE INC [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 39 *; | [A]US5841869 (MERKLING ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [A]US5937392 (ALBERTS CHARLES D [US]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2000US13885 | WO2000US21870 |