EP2006796 - Product verification and authentication system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optaglio Limited Basepoint Business Centre Caxton Close East Portway Industrial Estate Andover Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB | [2012/02] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Optaglio Limited Meridian House, Greenwich Way, Andover Hants SP10 4DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudson, Philip Meridian House Greenwich Way Andover, Hampshire SP10 4DU / GB | 02 /
Drinkwater, John Meridian House Greenwich Way Andover, Hampshire SP10 4DU / GB | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08166390.8 | 05.06.2001 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | GB20000013662 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0013662 | GB20000015091 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0015091 | GB20000019258 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0019258 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006796 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2006796 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06K19/06028 (EP,US);
G06K19/14 (EP,US);
G03H1/26 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0016 (EP,US);
G03H2001/221 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Produktprüf- und authentifizierungssystem und Verfahren | [2008/52] | English: | Product verification and authentication system and method | [2008/52] | French: | Système et procédé de vérification et d'authentification de produits | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/15] | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 28.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01934210.4 / EP1287486 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010934210) is 17.12.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   16.09.2010 | 30.06.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2212310 (STEP BY STEP CONSULTANTS LIMIT [GB]) [X] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9107724 (TEKNEKRON TRANSPORTATION SYSTE [US]) [X] 1,23,28* page 8, line 28 - page 12, line 16; figures 1,4 *; | [X]GB2332540 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-34 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 26 * * page 6, lines 4-8 * | by applicant | US456141 | US5034003 | WO9318419 | US5483363 | US5694229 |