EP2065062 - Syringe pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOREA INSTITUTE OF MACHINERY & MATERIALS 171, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ham, Young-Bog 504-902 Daedeok Technovalley Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-509, DAEJEON / KR | 02 /
Park, Jung-Ho 108-903 Daeeok Technovalley Apt., Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-720, Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Yun, So-Nam 105-703 Hana Apt., Sindeong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-721, DAEJEON / KR | 04 /
Seo, Woo-Suk 213 Dormitory, 104 Sinseongro, Yuseong-gu 305-804, DAEJEON / KR | 05 /
Chung, Tae-Young 202-201 Gyeongnam Honorsville, 719 Yongsan-dong Yuseong-gu 305-500, DAEJEON / KR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08166474.0 | 13.10.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | KR20070103742 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070103742 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065062 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, // H01L41/02 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0294 (EP,US);
A61M5/31515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spritzenpumpe | [2009/23] | English: | Syringe pump | [2009/23] | French: | Pompe de seringue | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 21.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005277887 (DOUGLAS JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0080] , [0085] - [0087]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]WO2006138091 (NEW SCALE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, lines 14-25 * * page 26, line 7 - page 27, line 14; figures 30-36,60-66 *; | [X]US2007129681 (OTT WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figures 1A,1B,1 *; | [A]US3902084 (MAY JR WILLIAM G) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6380661 (HENDERSON DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2005015057 (STEENFELDT-JENSEN SOREN [DK], et al) [A] 5 * page 10, paragraphs 1,2 *; | [A]WO9920330 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0006] * |