EP2055674 - Apparatus for producing trichlorosilane and method for producing thrichlorosilane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaba, Chikara c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Yokkaichi Plant 5, Mita-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [2016/37] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Inaba, Chikara c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation, Yokkaichi Plant 5, Mita-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08166613.3 | 14.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | JP20070275625 | 23.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007275625 | JP20080187500 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008187500 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055674 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055674 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/107, B01J8/18, F28F9/013 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B01J8/1836 (EP,US);
C01B33/08 (KR);
B01J8/34 (EP,US);
B01J8/38 (EP,US);
C01B33/10763 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00123 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00132 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2016/37] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Trichlorosilan und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Trichlorsilan | [2009/19] | English: | Apparatus for producing trichlorosilane and method for producing thrichlorosilane | [2009/19] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la production de trichlorosilane | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 07.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4176710 (FREUDLSPERGER HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0684070 (HEMLOCK SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [DX] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0776692 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN101125654 (ZHEJIANG KAIHUA SYNTHETIC MATE [CN]) [PX] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [A]US5063040 (RUFF KLAUS [DE]); | [A]US4044109 (KOTZSCH HAN-JOACHIM, et al) | by applicant | JPH0859221 | US4176710 | EP0684070 | EP0776692 |