EP2053479 - Apparatus and method for visualization of operating status in a process control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stluka, Petr Janskeho 241825 155 00 Prague 5 / CZ | 02 /
Navratil, Roman c/o Honeywell Int. Inc. Patent Services 101 Columbia Road AB-2B PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07982 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London Derbyshire EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08166846.9 | 16.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | US20070977048 | 23.10.2007 Original published format: US 977048 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053479 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053479 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Visualisierung des Betriebsstatus in einem Verfahrenssteuerungssystem | [2009/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for visualization of operating status in a process control system | [2009/18] | French: | Système et procédé de visualisation de l'état de fonctionnement dans un système de contrôle de procédé | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007005266 (BLEVINS TERRENCE L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0071] , [0161]; figure 1 *; | [X] - HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., "Operations Monitoring", HONEYWELL PRODUCT DOCUMENTATION, Honeywell Internet Pages, (20050302), pages 1 - 4, XP002512413 [X] 2,8 * page 2, column R * | by applicant | US2007005266 |