EP2058854 - A semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascatron AB Electrum 207 164 40 Kista / SE | [2015/09] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Acreo Swedish ICT AB Electrum 236 164 40 Kista / SE | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Acreo AB Electrum 236 164 40 Kista / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakowski, Mietek Öberg 715 SE-472 92, Stillingsön / SE | 02 /
Schöner, Adolf Snödroppsgränd 57 SE-165 74, Hässelby / SE | 03 /
Ericsson, Per Kometvägen 11 SE-175 67, Järfälla / SE | [2014/49] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
Bakowski, Mietek Öberg 715 SE-472 92, Stillingsön / SE | ||
02 /
Schöner, Adolf Snödroppsgränd 57 SE-165 74, Hässelby / SE | |||
03 /
Ericsson, Per Kometvägen 11 SE-175 67, Järfälla / SE | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Haag, Malina Anna, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2012/14] | Haag, Malina Anna, et al AWAPATENT AB Patent Department P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 08167263.6 | 22.10.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | SE20070002446 | 07.11.2007 Original published format: SE 0702446 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2058854 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2058854 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2058854 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/82, H01L27/06, H01L27/07, H01L21/04, H01L29/16 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/8213 (EP);
H01L27/0623 (EP);
H01L27/0705 (EP);
H01L29/1608 (EP);
H01L29/66068 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/20] | H01L21/82, H01L27/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [2009/20] | English: | A semiconductor device | [2009/20] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2008 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.03.2015 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 03.12.2014 | |
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS568873 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS57106173 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS5837957 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9411601U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 2 *; | [Y]WO2007001316 (SEMISOUTH LAB INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS57186361 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US6097046 (PLUMTON DONALD L [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0623951 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5244574 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5534458 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5539663 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - AGARWAL A K ET AL, "Large area, 1.3 kV, 17 A, bipolar junction transistors in 4H-SiC", 2003 IEEE 15TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND IC'S PROCEEDINGS. CAMBRIDGE, UIK, APRIL 14 - 17, 2003; [INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES & IC'S], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030414), doi:10.1109/ISPSD.2003.1225248, ISBN 978-0-7803-7876-6, pages 135 - 138, XP010653743 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPSD.2003.1225248 | Examination | WO9926296 | by applicant | US6091108 |