EP2070843 - Method and device for transporting objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerhard Schubert GmbH Hofäckerstrasse 7 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Gerhard / Am Haldenberg 22 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2012/19] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Schubert, Gerhard Am Haldenberg 22 74564, Crailsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Alber, Norbert, et al Patentanwalt Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167385.7 | 23.10.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | DE20071059611 | 11.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007059611 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070843 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070843 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G35/06 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B65G35/06 (EP);
B65G54/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Objekten | [2009/25] | English: | Method and device for transporting objects | [2009/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés au transport d'objets | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 27.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2008 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | IE | 23.10.2012 | LU | 23.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
LU | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19532956 (HUBER KURT [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-12 * columns 1-4; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [Y] 6-9,13-16; | [X]JPS58162424 (DAIFUKU MACHINERY WORKS) [X] 1,10 * Zusammenfassung * * figure 1 *; | [YA]US5388684 (PECK GLENN [US]) [Y] 6-8 * column 1, lines 35-40; figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 15-18,33-38 * [A] 5,11; | [YA]DE19709034 (NOELL STAHL UND MASCHINENBAU G [DE]) [Y] 14 * column 1, lines 52-55 * * column 2, lines 55-61 * * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 8,11; | [A]GB2110621 (SI HANDLING SYSTEMS) [A] 4 * page 1, lines 69-72; figures 1,3,5 *; | [Y]DE19745313 (KAMMANN MASCHF WERNER [DE]) [Y] 9,13 * column 7, lines 65-68 * * column 8, lines 1,2,10,11; figure 3 *; | [PX]DE102007017646 (IWK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 17 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [PX]DE102006045191 (SCHUBERT GERHARD GMBH [DE]) [PX] 17 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE10322556 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007]; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1336553 (EISENMANN KG MASCHBAU [DE]) [Y] 15 * Zusammenfassung * * paragraphs [0005] , [0021] , [0022] *; | [Y]JPH11334586 (KAJIMA CORP) [Y] 16 * figures 1-5 * * Zusammenfassung *; | [A]DE3917630 (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 12 * figure 1 * * Zusammenfassung *; | [A]DE4010024 (STICHT WALTER [AT]) [A] 12 * figure 1 * * Zusammenfassung * | by applicant | DE19532956 |