EP2055363 - Basic elements for furniture construction boxes, furniture construction boxes and children's play furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schildgen, Katharina Zentagasse 32/1 1050 Wien / AT | For all designated states Kirsch, Benedikt Zentagasse 32/1 1050 Wien / AT | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstrasse 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167502.7 | 24.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | DE20072014978U | 25.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007014978 U | DE20081001853 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008001853 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055363 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055363 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A63H33/008 (EP);
A63H33/046 (EP);
A63H3/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Grundelemente für Möbelbaukasten, Möbelbaukasten und Kinderspielmöbel | [2009/19] | English: | Basic elements for furniture construction boxes, furniture construction boxes and children's play furniture | [2009/19] | French: | Eléments de base pour boîtier de meuble, boîtier de meuble et meuble de jeu d'enfant | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HR | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | IE | 06.04.2011 | IT | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | NO | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | LU | 24.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9401833U (ELBE WERKSTAETTEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13* figures 1-12; claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO02055168 (VICENTELLI CLAUDIO [IT]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002193046 (ZEBERSKY JUDD [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-10; claims 1-25 *; | [X]US2006139134 (HUNTS LARRY D [US]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-18; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO2006095939 (MAGNET4U CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-14; claims 1-15 * | by applicant | WO02055168 | US2002193046 | US2006139134 | WO2006095939 |