EP2182128 - A suspendable ceiling island system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHICAGO METALLIC CONTINENTAL Oud Sluisstraat 5 2110 WIJNEGEM / BE | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stessel, Wilfried Zwetstraat 1 2520 Ranst / BE | 02 /
Borgers, Stéphane Armand Segerslei 123 2R 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 08167915.1 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182128 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/30, E04B9/12, E04B9/18 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
E04B9/30 (EP);
E04B9/127 (EP);
E04B9/18 (EP);
E04B9/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/02] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufhängbares Deckeninselsystem | [2010/18] | English: | A suspendable ceiling island system | [2010/18] | French: | Système d'îlots de plafond suspendu | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0516330 (USG INTERIORS INC [US]) [DX] 1,2,4-11,14 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [X]US5937605 (WENDT ALAN C [US]) [X] 1,4-10,14 * figure 8 *; | [X]US6298623 (WENDT ALAN C [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figure - *; | [X]EP1811098 (CHICAGO METALLIC CONTINENTAL [BE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,11* figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP0516330 |